U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00820
  • Case Name: CALIFORNIA INFRASTRUCTURE AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK et al v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.