U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01717
  • Case Name: PILLA v. AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.