U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00817
  • Case Name: NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.