U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02688
  • Case Name: CAI v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.