U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02696
  • Case Name: CHRISTIAN v. WASHINGTON DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Create Case Association]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: [Surreply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.