U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00079
  • Case Name: SEALE v. DOWNTOWNDC FOUNDATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.