U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00347
  • Case Name: GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT et al v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 24, 2025: [Modify]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 27, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.