U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00789
  • Case Name: FRANCIS et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [New Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • March 20, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.