U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00554
  • Case Name: KOLOA RUM COMPANY v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 11, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.