U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00838
  • Case Name: COLEMAN v. DUDEK
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2025: [Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.