U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00612
  • Case Name: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.