U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03228
  • Case Name: ECCLES v. O'MALLEY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 05, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.