U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03362
  • Case Name: BARBER v. NELNET, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 17, 2025: [Standing Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.