U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 99-00395-
  • Case Name: Sonja M. Gordy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Case Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order To Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Release Unclaimed Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.