U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01651
  • Case Name: CHEVALIER v. BAE SYSTEMS INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.