U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00839
  • Case Name: Rivas v. UNITED AMERICAN SECURITY, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.**]
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.