U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00578
  • Case Name: ZENITH CAREX INTERNATIONAL LIMITED v. CHEMONICS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.