U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00840
  • Case Name: OPEN TECHNOLOGY FUND v. Lake et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 20, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.