U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01837
  • Case Name: SMITH v. SAINT ELIZABETH HOSPITAL DEPARTMENT OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion For Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.