U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00556
  • Case Name: M.R. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • May 01, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.