U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03653
  • Case Name: LAWTON v. COMMISSIONER INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 31, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 31, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.