U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00853
  • Case Name: BROWN RUDNICK LLP v. DOE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.