U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00634
  • Case Name: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.