U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01332
  • Case Name: FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIAN ATHLETES et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.**]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.