U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00812
  • Case Name: STRAKER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.