U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00850
  • Case Name: LITTLEJOHN v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 25, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.