U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03431
  • Case Name: CAHILL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.