U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00303
  • Case Name: MBAZANG v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2025: [Rule 26a1 Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Modify]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.