U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00809
  • Case Name: POHLE v. ROBERTS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing an Appeal with the Supreme Court]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 10, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.