U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00577
  • Case Name: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.