U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUSSAIN PARKAR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 22, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 16, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 16, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arrest ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Revoke]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.