U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00857
  • Case Name: CRISTOSAL HUMAN RIGHTS et al v. MAROCCO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.