U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00855
  • Case Name: FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 24, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.