U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01512
  • Case Name: BYRD v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Hold in Abeyance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.