U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00683
  • Case Name: MARSH v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2025: [Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.