U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00858
  • Case Name: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 24, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 23, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 23, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.