U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00179
  • Case Name: VENIGALLA v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES' ADMINISTRATIVE APPEALS OFFICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.