U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00867
  • Case Name: YOCHA DEHE WINTUN NATION et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.