U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00862
  • Case Name: MAKON v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Standing Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Clarify]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • March 25, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 24, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.