U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00420
  • Case Name: NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.