U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00415
  • Case Name: STORCH et al v. HEGSETH et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.