U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00190
  • Case Name: MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK et al v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.