U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00529
  • Case Name: AGYEMAN et al v. BONDI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.