U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00880
  • Case Name: EDWARDS v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.