U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00885
  • Case Name: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.