U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00883
  • Case Name: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. HEGSETH et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 22, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.