U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00870
  • Case Name: BIEN-AIME v. AMERICAN PUBLIC EDUCATION, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 26, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.