U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00187
  • Case Name: HOOLI v. FLORIDA/ADVENTIST HOSPITAL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 03, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 03, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.