U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00889
  • Case Name: JACKSON et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.