U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00888
  • Case Name: EWOUDOU v. SCOTT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 29, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.